GLOUCESTERSHIRE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, in Gloucestershire, the welfare of patients suffering from kidney disease by providing equipment for the renal unit not provided by the hospital trust and providing an annual holiday for the patients plus day trips and events, in accordance with the Charity Commission's public benefit guidance. It sends delegates to the Nat. Kidney Fed. Conference and helps patients to attend info days
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 15 November 1989: Standard registration
- G K P A (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lily Gidley | Chair | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Faye Ann Mayo | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mayo | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Matthews | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM MAYO | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Graham | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANNE DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £2.55k | £2.64k | £7.16k | £3.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.34k | £5.36k | £1.30k | £1.30k | £16.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1989 as amended on 15 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THROUGHOUT GLOUCESTERSHIRE THE WELFARE OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Westfield
Highnam
Gloucester
Gloucestershire
GL3 1EE
- Phone:
- 01452 311199
- Email:
- gloskpa@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window