JOHN CABOT ACADEMY

Charity Number: 900189
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Secondary school - academy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1989: Standard registration
  • 25 August 2011: Removed (Exempt charity)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • JOHN CABOT C T C (Working name)
  • JOHN CABOT C T C BRISTOL TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE KINGSWOOD CITY TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE BRISTOL TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £4.97m £5.23m £6.58m £8.67m £8.97m
Total expenditure £5.25m £5.46m £5.77m £6.45m £7.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £70.87k £52.39k £114.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £254.80k £11.32k £374.88k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £6.21m £8.26m £8.22m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £48.63k £102.77k £67.43k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £239.51k £196.31k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £5.72m £6.40m £7.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £19.68k £18.04k £19.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Own use assets N/A N/A £9.83m £11.16m £12.70m
Long-term investments N/A N/A £1 £1 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £1.72m £2.51m £2.99m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 -£279.00k -£332.00k
Total liabilities N/A N/A £433.95k £345.49k £507.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 23 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 11 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 17 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 27 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 30 November 2007 On Time