Governing document YOUTH PARTICIPATION AND SUPPORT

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2016 as amended on 06 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1.to provide treatment for enuresis and other problems of bladder or bowel control, to children and adults; to provide counselling, advice, information, equipment or other aids or materials, to those suffering from enuresis or other problems of bladder or bowel control, and their families and carers, in order to assist in the treatment, management and alleviation of those problems and their effects upon daily life; to educate professionals, families and the public in the field of bladder or bowel control and their effects, to promote and provide services which are needed by children and adults suffering from problems of bladder or bowel control, and their families or carers,in direct or indirect consequences of those problems. 2. the promotion of health for the benefit of children and young adults in England and Wales who have problems of substance misuse, or are at risk of such problems, by the provision of treatment, intervention, education, counselling, information, advice and support to such children and young adults, and/or training, education, information, advice and support to their parents, carers or to professionals or others working with them. 3. the advancement of education for children in England and Wales by working with schools to enable their pupils' participation in public consultations carried out by parliamentary, national or local government departments or bodies or by other organisations, explaining to children the matters being consulted upon, and ascertaining, submitting and publishing their views on those matters. 4. the advancement of education for children in England and Wales by working with schools to assist in their pupils? language, literacy and communication skills.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.