Financial history STONE ALLERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 900228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.36k £10.85k £10.65k £1.13k £1.21k
Total expenditure £6.68k £523 £1.17k £944 £1.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.10k N/A N/A