COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's objectives, as defined in the Memorandum and Articles of Association, are the promotion of any exclusively charitable purpose in the United Kingdom and elsewhere which is in the opinion of the Council beneficial to the community but with a preference for the community in Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- GCF (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- CHARITIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Kate Doherty | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Henry McClean | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Griffiths | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nelson Gary Tarleton | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Renton | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Hartshorn | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Paul Williams | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Thayers | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HENRY CLAUDE WINWOOD ROBINSON | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Esme Estella Lord | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSINA JANE TUFNELL | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Ingle Mr | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRACY CLARK | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Stewart Dunley | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.28k | £1.72m | £469.95k | £559.16k | £476.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £465.75k | £1.38m | £984.56k | £734.39k | £709.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £169.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.66m | N/A | £503.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £7.15k | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £61.78k | N/A | £64.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £80.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.23m | N/A | £544.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £149.98k | N/A | £189.89k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.45k | N/A | £5.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £1.21m | N/A | £500.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £33.45k | N/A | £35.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH IS IN THE OPINION OF THE COUNCIL BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE COMMUNITY IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o
The Manor
Boddington
Cheltenhen
Gloucestershire
GL51 0TJ
- Phone:
- 07557478855
- Email:
- ceo@gloucestershirecf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window