Financial history DORCHESTER-ON-THAMES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 900244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.45k £39.36k £16.06k £17.23k £14.11k
Total expenditure £12.46k £12.14k £10.58k £22.98k £40.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £17.37k £2.67k N/A N/A