Financial history HILDA FLORENCE HOLMES TRUST

Charity Number: 900250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £40.01k £32.22k £31.11k £35.06k £28.27k
Total expenditure £62.34k £87.67k £125.64k £157.25k £144.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A