BRISTOL OLD VIC THEATRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education and training for actors and technical skills for the media industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£3,284,982
Donations and legacies | £289.47k | |
Charitable activities | £2.94m | |
Other trading activities | £2.14k | |
Investments | £58.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,975,387
Raising funds | £5.44k | |
Charitable activities | £3.97m | |
Other | £170 |
-£7,895 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £253,379 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.61k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.97m |
People

45 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 30 January 1990: Standard registration
- BOVTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Michael Wilson | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Robinson | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Thomas | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Faye Lloyd | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Austin Milne | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eccleson MSc FICA | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
alfred william stuart conner | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
philip alan tanner | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
paul christopher baker | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89m | £2.80m | £3.02m | £3.67m | £3.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82m | £2.69m | £2.94m | £3.34m | £3.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £731.84k | £643.36k | £830.68k | £900.80k | £253.38k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £823.32k | £715.22k | £898.14k | £947.71k | £289.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.45k | £11.23k | £39.79k | £8.10k | £2.14k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.02m | £2.05m | £2.07m | £2.66m | £2.94m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £28.27k | £20.78k | £10.54k | £50.24k | £58.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.80m | £2.68m | £2.93m | £3.34m | £3.97m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.62k | £5.26k | £5.30k | £5.55k | £5.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.72k | £17.21k | £36.42k | £55.73k | £123.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.06k | £5.04k | £5.08k | £5.34k | £5.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.96k | £1.65k | £2.58k | £698 | £170 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.86m | £5.79m | £5.69m | £5.61m | £5.51m | |
|
Long-term investments | £874.89k | £816.49k | £907.29k | £909.65k | £896.53k | |
|
Other assets | £1.29m | £1.08m | £1.57m | £1.69m | £1.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.04m | £644.82k | £954.63k | £651.21k | £618.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18TH DECEMBER 1989 AND 3 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 22 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY OPERATING A VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING ESTABLISHMENT OT FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ACTORS, ACTRESS, STAGE MANAGERS, CARPENTERS, ELECTRICIANS, SOUND TECHNICIANS, COSTUME DESIGNERS, PROPERTY MAKERS AND DIRECTORS AND BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bristol Old Vic Theatre School
1-2 Downside Road
BRISTOL
BS8 2XF
- Phone:
- 0117 973 3535
- Email:
- enquiries@oldvic.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window