THE DORSET ENVIRONMENTAL RECORDS CENTRE TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the advancement of public education in the natural history and geology of Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,346 from 21 government contract(s) and £2,350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 12 January 1990: Standard registration
- DERC (Working name)
- DORSET ENVIRONMENTAL RECORDS CENTRE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN GRAEME COOK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nichola Taylor | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Howard Sterling | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Diane Cooch | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Judy King | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER DAVIS | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNIFER ANN CRIPPS | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NATURAL ENGLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ANN HATTEN WELTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
IMOGEN DAVENPORT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY NEWBOULD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.67k | £173.02k | £274.22k | £228.51k | £283.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.98k | £168.87k | £183.08k | £247.05k | £269.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £85.08k | £37.32k | £67.99k | £83.40k | £60.35k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £12.10k | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 DECEMBER 1999 AND 18 OCT 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE NATURAL HISTORY AND GEOLOGY OF THE COUNTY OF DORSET BY THE COLLECTION OF INFORMATION AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE SAME BY VARIOUS MEANS INCULDING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS AND DISPLAYS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dorset History Centre
Bridport Road
Dorchester
DT1 1RP
- Phone:
- 01305225081
- Email:
- derc@dorsetcouncil.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window