WOODCHESTER MANSION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open days, guided tours for public, educational & private groups; Hire for weddings, TV & film production, commercial photography etc; Fundraising for major repair projects; Masonry & traditional building training courses; Developing courses for training bodies;Developing strategic plan with Stroud District Council & National Trust for future of Woodchester Mansion & Woodchester Park as an entity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Rhiannon Wigzell | Chair | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
john Christopher Goom | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Granger | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Townsend | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mary Davenport | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RODERICK JAMES MARLOW | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Patrick Roger Thomas Conaghan | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.91k | £429.86k | £468.38k | £243.43k | £183.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.71k | £267.90k | £557.46k | £356.45k | £176.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.50k | £31.53k | £31.36k | £62.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH DECEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 OCT 2017 as amended on 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
(I) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND FOR THE NATION AT LARGE WOODCHESTER PARK MANSION AND ALSO WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTITUTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE IN THE FORM OF BUILDING (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. (II) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STONEMASONS ARCHITECTS AND OTHERS CONCERNED WITH BUILDING IN THE USE OF COTSWOLD STONE AND OTHER TRADITIONAL BUILDING SKILLS AND TO USE AND PERMIT THE WOODCHESTER PARK MANSION TO BE USED AND ENJOYED AS A CENTRE FOR SUCH PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODCHESTER MANSION TRUST
WOODCHESTER MANSION
WOODCHESTER PARK
NYMPSFIELD
STONEHOUSE
GL10 3TS
- Phone:
- 01453861541
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window