Trustees WOODCHESTER MANSION TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 900315

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Rhiannon Wigzell | Chair | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
john Christopher Goom | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Granger | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Townsend | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mary Davenport | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RODERICK JAMES MARLOW | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Patrick Roger Thomas Conaghan | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.