SUMMERTOWN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating the public in the Art and Science of Music by the rehearsal of choral music, the presentation of public concerts and other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 January 1990: Standard registration
- SCS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Mary Lawrence-Wilson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Best | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Record | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Padraic Wilson | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Charles | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Scott | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Graham Young | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Palmer | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.16k | £6.76k | £24.98k | £29.35k | £39.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.29k | £10.23k | £24.31k | £30.04k | £31.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE REHEARSAL OF CHORAL MUSIC, THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 Coopers Gate
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX16 2WD
- Phone:
- 07817 962784
- Email:
- info@summertownchoral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window