Governing document SUMMERTOWN CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 900317

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE REHEARSAL OF CHORAL MUSIC, THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.