Trustees SUMMERTOWN CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 900317

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Mary Lawrence-Wilson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Best | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Record | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Padraic Wilson | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Charles | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Scott | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Graham Young | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Palmer | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.