EXETER HOUSE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Key work of the charity is overseeing the allocation of funds raised for the support of Exeter House Special School. Due to a major rebuild project and changes in personnel, fundraising activities have been on-hold during this year. The charity has now been revived and work is in hand to re-commence fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 March 1990: Standard registration
- EXETER HOUSE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Vanessa Baylis | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Martin | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Barbara Murley | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.13k | £6.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £654 | £565 | £576 | £3.46k | £28.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/05/1982 AS AMENDED ON 18/01/1990 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exeter House Special School
Somerset Road
Salisbury
SP1 3BL
- Phone:
- 01722 334168
- Email:
- alisonmurley@sret.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window