Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF HIGHCLIFFE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 900343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 27 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 March 2025 309 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required