FLEET MEADOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish the Fleet Meadow Community Centre and to maintain and manage it in order to benefit the inhabitants in the local area of Didcot, advancing education and providing facilities in the interests of social welfare, for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Total income includes £10,096 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 1990: Standard registration
- 02 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1200789 FLEET MEADOW COMMUNITY HALL TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.58k | £29.65k | £27.27k | £26.09k | £31.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.89k | £23.47k | £24.31k | £16.10k | £16.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.81k | £10.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 11/02/2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE MILLBROOK AND NORTHBOURNE WARDS OF THE PARISH OF DIDCOT AND ADJOINING AREAS IN THE PARISH OF EAST HAGBOURNE AND IN THE NEIGHBOURING WARDS OF THE PARISH OF DIDCOT, OXFORDSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE- TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window