Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH SWALLOWS SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS

Charity Number: 900367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 03 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 06 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 20 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window