Financial history Brightwell Pre-School

Charity Number: 900373
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £70.68k £99.05k £107.96k £93.28k £145.54k
Total expenditure £79.66k £95.34k £95.37k £104.68k £129.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £72.26k £64.12k £54.36k £88.80k