Accounts and annual returns PAMPHILL PARISH HALL

Charity number: 900375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 March 2024 13 February 2025 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 21 March 2023 05 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 21 March 2022 05 February 2024 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 21 March 2021 05 February 2024 745 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 21 March 2020 16 December 2023 1059 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2020 Not Required