PAMPHILL PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES. PROVIDING A PREMISES FOR USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 March 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP OWEN CHISSELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARJORIE AILEEN CHERRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN CROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH BAMBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/03/2020 | 21/03/2021 | 21/03/2022 | 21/03/2023 | 21/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £525 | £4.31k | £3.77k | £4.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.95k | £2.63k | £4.80k | £4.90k | £6.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2021 | 05 February 2024 | 745 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2020 | 16 December 2023 | 1059 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PAMPHILL AND SHAPWICK IN THE COUNTY OF DORSETSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES, CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF PAMPHILL AND SHAPWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cowgrove Farm
Cowgrove
WIMBORNE
Dorset
BH21 4EL
- Phone:
- 01202 883369
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window