69TH BRISTOL (ST JOSEPHS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 900406
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a Scout Group in the Bristol area as a member of the national Scout Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income: £1,340
Total expenditure: £1,598
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Bristol City
Governance
Registration history:
- 04 April 1990: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £0 | £920 | £921 | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £665 | £1.35k | £1.38k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window