MORETONHAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make available a modern and well equipped club room to use for community activities and meetings including Community larder, First aid site, craft groups, community coffee mornings and charity fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 05 April 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Hills | Chair | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Heather Bennett | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Sutton Sheppard | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Franklyn Forrest | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Stansfield | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Spittles MBE | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Claire Beesley | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £912 | £3.57k | £4.20k | £4.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £2.47k | £2.01k | £3.58k | £5.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED 21ST OCTOBER AND 15TH MARCH 1990 as amended on 26 Jul 2023 as amended on 26 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB IS TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN MORETONHAMPSTEAD AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
MORETONHAMPSTEAD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Court Street
Moretonhampstead
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 8NE
- Phone:
- 01647441577
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window