Trustees OXFORD SAIL TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 900436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Wale Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Hermione Stanley Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
Rosemary Turtle Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
Eelwood Thorne Trustee 26 November 2023
None on record
James Winkley Trustee 26 November 2023
None on record
Julian Pearson Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
George Edward Simmonds Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Simon Hotchin Trustee 04 February 2015
None on record