GLOUCESTER LAW CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free, independent legal advice on Welfare Benefits and Housing for tenants to residents of Gloucester, and in some cases Gloucestershire, subject to eligibility for Legal Aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2024
Total income includes £123,341 from 1 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Porter | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
STELLA JENSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JAMES DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Christopher John Hill | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 15/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320.50k | £331.23k | £231.63k | £195.23k | £205.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.28k | £201.90k | £314.51k | £232.88k | £288.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £97.67k | £123.34k | |
|
Income from government grants | £95.00k | £150.44k | £110.00k | £92.79k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 1985 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 12 APRIL 1988, 15 MAY 1989, 14 NOVEMBER 1989, 4 NOVEMBER 1992, 17 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFIT AREA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH LEGAL SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE OBTAIN THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFIT AREA. (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY FOR PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN THE BENEFIT AREA.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE (MAINLY CITY OF GLOUCESTER)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wiltshire Law Centre
Sanford House
Sanford Street
SWINDON
SN1 1HE
- Phone:
- 01452423492
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window