THE CAMS HILL SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Cams Hill Secondary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
- 15 August 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £2.76k | £1.46k | £1.90k | £176 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.90k | £0 | £0 | £9.90k | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 13 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUST MAY:- A. FOSTER MORE ENTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window