LITTLETON LOCAL HISTORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research local history of Littleton.Produce Publications of local interest.Arrange lectures of associated topics for member's meetings. As the result of a special General Meeting of the group on 23 March 23 the LLHG is closing down and disposing of its financial assets in accordance with the constitution. The Group will cease to be a charity and is cancelling its membership with immediate effect
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEIRDRE ELIZABETH WRATTEN | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Skinner | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GILBERT LUPTON | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CANON DAVID BRUCE KINGTON | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MASKILL | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £826 | £366 | £29 | £4 | £91 | |
|
Total expenditure | £804 | £617 | £145 | £527 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF LITTLETON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA AND TO PROMOTE AND TO UNDERTAKE RELATED RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Rewlands Drive
Winchester
SO22 6PA
- Phone:
- 01962881151
- Email:
- maskill_john892@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window