SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CROSSROADS (CARING FOR CARERS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 02 July 1990: Standard registration
- 20 February 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRENCHAY CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (Previous name)
- SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21ST FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 22ND MAY 1991 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL,MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS,OR B) AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES TO PROVIDE SUCH CARE ATTENDANTS FOR SUCH DISABLED PEOPLE LIVING ALONE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE FRENCHAY HEALTH AUTHORITY AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.