WEST MEON AND WARNFORD SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cricket - Senior & Junior Football - Senior & Junior Tennis - two all weather courts Hockey - Hampshire League Division 4 Promoting these sports for the participation of all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH MORRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Anthony Otter | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Brown | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
M T EDWARDS | Trustee | 10 April 1987 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM RICHARD EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD STURGES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mary Edwards | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE WALLER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.53k | £13.04k | £12.51k | £7.24k | £8.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.67k | £4.87k | £3.13k | £5.74k | £11.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.20k | £6.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE (OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST MEON AND WARNFORD) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECTT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS HAVING PARTICULAR NEED FOR THOSE FACILITIES BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. II) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
WEST MEON AND WARNFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Park View
High Street
West Meon
Petersfield
GU32 1LN
- Phone:
- 01730829689
- Email:
- maryandrory@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
westmeon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window