COMMUNITY FIRST OXFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community First Oxfordshire's aim is to make a real contribution to improving the quality of life for all who live or work in Oxfordshire, particularly those who are disadvantaged. In pursuit of this aim we have two primary objectives: Firstly, to help communities in Oxfordshire to identify and tackle local needs and problems. Secondly, to enable and encourage a variety of voluntary initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £305,277 from 11 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
- O R C C (Working name)
- OXFORDSHIRE RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Horgan | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Emily Rose Urquhart | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Kenneford | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Wilderspin | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Robert Taylor | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Steven Bright | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.53k | £334.47k | £343.03k | £366.33k | £461.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.60k | £334.11k | £373.36k | £359.29k | £419.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £77.44k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £285.53k | £241.09k | £142.59k | £231.48k | £305.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/01/1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/10/2015 as amended on 28 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE; AND TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION AND TO CARRY OUT ANY ACTIVITY WITHIN OR OUTSIDE THE COUNTY THAT ASSISTS IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAID PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Stables
Worton Park
Worton
WITNEY
OX29 4SU
- Phone:
- 01865883488
- Email:
- info@communityfirstoxon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window