Financial history BASINGSTOKE DIAL-A-RIDE

Charity number: 900594
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £419.90k £167.40k £103 £94 £129
Total expenditure £397.46k £186.93k £9.29k £12.63k £182.47k
Income from government contracts £270.82k £112.84k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.46k £4.31k N/A N/A N/A