THAME BARNS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The centre is a community facility in Thame with several meeting rooms and a fully equipped kitchen available for functions, lunches etc. The centre is widely used by local businesses (for meetings and conferences), by a cross section of community groups and popular for family celebrations and wedding receptions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 July 1990: Standard registration
- THAME BARNS (Working name)
- THE CHURCH FARM BARNS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIE GIBSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Gurney | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||
rev Andy McCulloch | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Clayton | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hereward Baines | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA STURDY | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAM DODDS | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.96k | £75.45k | £169.11k | £153.95k | £193.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.02k | £106.33k | £140.45k | £158.43k | £171.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | £16.41k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21ST MAY 1990 AS AMENDED 16 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS CHURCH FARM BARNS, CHURCH ROAD, THAME, OXFORDSHIRE FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF THAME AFORESAID FOR COMMUNITY RECREATION AND FOR THE AUTHORISED USES OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THAME INCLUDING USE BY THE RELIGIOUS BODIES COMPRISED IN THE THAME COUNCIL OF CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THAME
Contact information
- Address:
-
THAME BARNS CENTRE
CHURCH ROAD
THAME
OX9 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01844217308
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window