THAMES VALLEY ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TVAW aims to rescue and rehome abandoned, illtreated and unwanted cats and kittens. Veterinary treatment is provided and all animals are neutered. The cats are cared for individually in foster homes until suitable homes are found. We also operate a lost and found register and a low cost neutering scheme. All of the work is carried out by volunteers and funded by donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 July 1990: Standard registration
- T V A W (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Phelan | Chair | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erzsebet Bodonyi | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Shearman | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eva Slattery | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Parfitt | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Linda Wells | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rohan James Daniels | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HILARY WESTGARTH | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE LAKER | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE ROOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.01k | £98.00k | £204.00k | £234.24k | £111.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.03k | £108.00k | £115.00k | £160.60k | £152.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE AND ACCOMMODATION FOR DOMESTIC ANIMALS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO AND SUFFERING AMONGST DOMESTIC ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
THAMES VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
T V A W
PO Box 3139
READING
RG1 9FQ
- Phone:
- 01189479963
- Email:
- tvawcats2018@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window