DAYSPRING CHURCH

Charity Number: 900628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity supports a number of people working in overseas mission. We also support and host activities within our objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,842
Total expenditure: £2,380

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Leeds City
  • India
  • Turkey
  • Uzbekistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • DAYSPRING CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bela Singh Trustee 13 August 2018
None on record
GILLIAN THORNBOROUGH Trustee 07 December 2015
ROTHWELL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: 14 days late
ANNE ROSEMARY SIMKINS Trustee 18 March 2001
OTLEY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
ROGER MARTIN KIRBY Trustee 03 June 1990
ROTHWELL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: 14 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.23k £13.56k £12.87k £8.49k £2.84k
Total expenditure £10.61k £15.29k £10.68k £11.28k £2.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 SANDYBANK AVENUE
ROTHWELL
LEEDS
LS26 0ER
Phone:
01132827829
Website:

No information available