Register of Charities - The Charity Commission RICHARD VERNON

Charity number: 216445-6
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 JUNE 1880 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 30 SEPTEMBER 1904, 18 DECEMBER 1956 AND 12 OCTOBER 1962.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND SICK
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF MIDDLEWICH
Registration history
  • 01 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 21 May 2007: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of