Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES LAND NO 1

Charity number: 216445-8
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 JUNE 1880 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 18 DECEMBER 1956 AND 12 OCTOBER 1962
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND SICK.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MIDDLEWICH
Registration history
  • 01 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 21 May 2007: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of