Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ENDOWMENT FOR THE BENEFICE OF WORMHILL

Charity number: 216446-3
Removed charity
Governing document
DEEDS DATED 5/11/1751 AND 17/6/1859 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 4/4/1919 AND 4/4/1924
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CURATE AT WORMHILL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 May 1964: Standard registration
  • 14 February 1997: Removed
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of