Governing document
SCHEMES OF 21 MARCH 1890, 16 SEPTEMBER 1949 AND 18 MARCH 1952.
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE OF DISCHARGED PRISONERS PRIMARILY WHO HAVE BEEN IMPRISONED IN PRESTON PRISON; OR WHO HAD BEEN COMMITTED FROM MAGISTRATES COURTS PREFERABLY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF PRESTON AND COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Registration history
- 19 March 1964 : Standard registration
- 23 February 2001 : Removed
- 23 February 2001 : Asset transfer out