Linked charity 1053793-39 ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY WITHIN THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history