Linked charity 1053793-36 ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MENTAL HEALTH GENERAL FUND
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NHS WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE AT SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history