Linked charity 1053793-19 PRIMARY CARE TRUST STAFF WELFARE FUND
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 31 JULY 2008 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS WITHIN THE SOUTH ESSEX AREA, BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF OF THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history