Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JANUARY 2005 AND CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH A BROADLY BASED CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED: IN PRACTICE GATESHEAD
Registration history
- 19 May 2005 : Standard registration
- 25 August 2011 : Removed