Linked charity 248711-20 MARY ANN LANDERS BEQUEST
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 1914 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 JUNE 1964, 3 JUNE 1970, 22 FEBRUARY 1975, 2 JUNE 1992, 20 MAY 1998 AND 11 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, AID AND FURTHER, WITHIN THE PROVINCES OF CANTERBURY AND YORK, THE OBJECTS AND WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OF ANY DIOCESE OR PARISH THEREOF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 27TH MAY 1914 AS AMENDED 22ND FEBRUARY 1975, AND AS AMENDED 2ND JUNE 1992)
Area of benefit
PROVINCES OF CANTERBURY AND YORK
Registration history