Linked charity 1072645-1 THE ROBERT WILLIS AND VIOLET WILLIS TRUST HOME (BETHSHAN AND ELSHADDAI)
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE NET PROCEEDS OF SALE MUST BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REST, CONVALESCENCE, RECOVERY AND RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history