Governing document
SCHEME OF 03/12/1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10/05/1962 AND 07/03/1974
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTBURY-UPON-TRYM
Registration history
- 04 March 1992 : Standard registration
- 14 October 2005 : Removed
- 14 October 2005 : Asset transfer out