THE DAVID LEWIS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides services to children, young people and adults including a Special Needs School, Specialist College and Adult Day Services with residential care for young people aged 16 and older and adults. This is supported by specialist medical, therapeutic and assessment services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£36,191,000
Donations and legacies | £367.00k | |
Charitable activities | £35.58m | |
Other trading activities | £147.00k | |
Investments | £97.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£37,519,000
Raising funds | £110.00k | |
Charitable activities | £37.41m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £34,796,953 from 89 government contract(s) and £783,047 from 72 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £110.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £37.41m |
People

980 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1993: Standard registration
- THE DAVID LEWIS CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE DAVID LEWIS ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WALKER | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Christine Green | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Elaine Cartwright | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Brearley | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul McKevitt | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ellis | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Halliwell | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Kalloo | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Spencer | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF LOUGHLIN | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Hollows | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.87m | £30.22m | £27.96m | £30.82m | £36.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.72m | £26.04m | £26.69m | £31.63m | £37.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £27.74m | £27.48m | £27.16m | £29.85m | £34.80m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.05m | £1.02m | £584.74k | £569.01k | £783.05k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £28.00k | £87.00k | £193.00k | £256.00k | £367.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £45.00k | £18.00k | £18.00k | £76.00k | £147.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.79m | £28.50m | £27.75m | £30.42m | £35.58m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.00k | £1.00k | £4.00k | £66.00k | £97.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.62m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £65.00k | £109.00k | £0 | £65.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £27.69m | £26.04m | £26.67m | £31.59m | £37.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £33.00k | £0 | £15.00k | £48.00k | £110.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.00k | £33.00k | £35.00k | £40.00k | £32.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £15.02m | £14.04m | £11.86m | £13.81m | £14.74m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.67m | £10.05m | £10.65m | £8.11m | £7.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.76m | -£1.36m | £6.51m | £2.11m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.13m | £2.90m | £2.29m | £2.73m | £2.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 FEBRUARY 1993, 1 MAY 1997, 12 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 17 APRIL 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, INCLUDING EPILEPSY AND ASSOCIATED NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS ("THE BENEFICIARIES") IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING: = TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION = EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES = MEDICAL OR CLINICAL TREATMENT = SOCIAL AND WELFARE ACTIVITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES 3.2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY CONDUCTING OR SUPPORTING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF THE BENEFICIARIES' DISABILITIES AND CONDITIONS AND PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 30 June 1993 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
David Lewis
Mill Lane
ALDERLEY EDGE
Cheshire
SK9 7UD
- Phone:
- 01565640000
- Email:
- enquiries@davidlewis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window