LINCOLNSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE FILM ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To seek out and preserve motion picture film showing life and work in the historic county of Lincolnshire, and to make such film accessible to all with an interest in Lincolnshire's local history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 September 1990: Standard registration
- LINCOLNSHIRE FILM ARCHIVE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN RYDE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Glyn Halgarth | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM BIGGADIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ADRIAN BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £2.83k | £1.42k | £914 | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £949 | £945 | £404 | £0 | £257 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH AUGUST 1990. AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LOCAL HISTORY, CUSTOMS, CULTURE AND ARTISTIC AND ECOLOGICAL HERITAGE WITHIN THE AREA OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE OF CINEMATOGRAPHIC FILM RELATED TO THE SUBJECT WHETHER ON FILM, VIDEOTAPES OR OTHER MEDIUM 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTISTIC EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE OF SUCH CINEMATOGRAPHIC FILM AND OF ANY KIND OF LITERARY DOCUMENTARY OR PRODUCTION MATERIAL RELATED TO SUCH CINEMATOGRAPHIC FILM
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE, EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, COUNTY AND CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 AMOS WAY
SIBSEY
BOSTON
PE22 0SU
- Phone:
- 01205751584
- Email:
- info@lincsfilm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window