Financial history THE HUMAN SCALE EDUCATION MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1000400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.04k £1.57k £1.81k £2.68k £2.33k
Total expenditure £1.05k £952 £3.18k £4.89k £2.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A