THE HUMAN SCALE EDUCATION MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion, by way of research, training, consultancy, seminars and other means, of education in small groupings in which effective learning can be better encouraged and undertaken in an ambience of mutual respect.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1990: Standard registration
- HUMAN SCALE EDUCATION (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN PRECEY | Chair | 27 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Megan Cousins | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dan Jones | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Grubb | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Koschyk | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Jennifer Helen Nuin Smith | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ROSALYN SPENCER | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £1.57k | £1.81k | £2.68k | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £952 | £3.18k | £4.89k | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/08/1990 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN SMALL GROUPINGS IN WHICH EFFECTIVE LEARNING CAN BE BETTER ENCOURAGED AND UNDERTAKEN IN AN AMBIENCE OF MUTUAL RESPECT AND CARE FOR THE NEEDS OF OTHERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUARRENDEN
UPPER RED CROSS ROAD
GORING
READING
RG8 9BD
- Phone:
- 01491873548
- Email:
- info@hse.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window