Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS AND DISTRICT CHRISTIAN YOUTH

Charity number: 1000519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £49.53k £52.23k £60.64k £50.97k £48.73k
Total expenditure £41.83k £48.41k £54.58k £85.61k £84.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A